This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/07/2022 at 19:41:00 (UTC).

PEDRO J. GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER FOR MDC VS LIT INDUSTRIAL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 PEDRO J GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER FOR MDC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against LIT INDUSTRIAL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pedro J. Garcia, as Property Appraiser for MDC

Defendants

LIT Industrial Limited Partnership

Jim Zingale, as Executive Director of the State FL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bonzon-Keenan, Geraldine Teresa

Defendant Attorney

Savoca, John Gary

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/27/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/27/2021 - Complaint

Notice of Interrogatory

07/27/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

07/27/2021 - Request for Production

Lis Pendens

07/27/2021 - Lis Pendens

Notice:

09/03/2021 - Notice:

Notice of Appearance

09/10/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Answer and Affirmative Defense

09/30/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Lis Pendens

07/27/2021 - Lis Pendens

Service Returned

11/23/2021 - Service Returned

Order Setting CM Deadline

11/30/2021 - Order Setting CM Deadline

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2740069AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:GOVT CIVIL CIRTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:11/01/2021REGISTER#:274CASHIER:CASSEUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: LIT Industrial Limited Partnership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Savoca John Gary; Jim Zingale as Executive Director of the State FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSESJOHN.SAVOCA@MYFLORIDALEGAL.COM Parties: Savoca John Gary; Jim Zingale as Executive Director of the State FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020362AMT PAID:$410.00NAME:BONZON-KEENAN, GERALDINE TERESA111 NW 1ST ST STE 2800MIAMI FL 33128-1930COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$410.00RECEIPT DATE:07/28/2021REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32656:1331; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIT INDUSTRIAL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP) is a litigant

Latest cases where Pedro J. Garcia as Property Appraiser for Miami- is a litigant

Latest cases where Jim Zingale as Executive Director of the State of is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Savoca, John Gary