This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/12/2023 at 02:51:31 (UTC).

PEDRO J. GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER FOR MDC VS BENZOL PROPERTIES CORP ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 PEDRO J GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER FOR MDC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against BENZOL PROPERTIES CORP. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pedro J. Garcia, as Property Appraiser for MDC

Defendants and Counter Plaintiffs

Benzol Properties Corp

Jim Zingale, as Executive Director of the State FL

Peter Cam as Tax Collector for Miami-Dade County, Florida

Counter Defendants

Garcia, Pedro J, Property Appraiser

Cam, Peter (Tax Collector)

Zingale, Jim (Executive Director)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bonzon-Keenan, Geraldine Teresa

Defendant and Counter Defendant Attorney

Cruz, Ileana

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/07/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Notice of Interrogatory

07/07/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

07/07/2021 - Complaint

Notice of Production

07/07/2021 - Notice of Production

Lis Pendens

07/08/2021 - Lis Pendens

Final Judgment by Judge

02/09/2022 - Final Judgment by Judge

Notice:

01/06/2022 - Notice:

Order Setting Non-Jury Trial

12/01/2021 - Order Setting Non-Jury Trial

Order Setting CM Deadline

11/30/2021 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice of Appearance

11/23/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Case Management Report

11/23/2021 - Case Management Report

Order to File

11/08/2021 - Order to File

Notice of Unavailability/absence

10/29/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Service Returned

10/22/2021 - Service Returned

Answer

10/19/2021 - Answer

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

10/11/2021 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

09/27/2021 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Service Returned

09/17/2021 - Service Returned

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 33018:511; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Benzol Properties Corp; Jim Zingale as Executive Director of the State FL; Peter Cam as Tax Collector for Miami-Dade County Florida

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting Non-Jury Trial; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON 08-15-2022. CALENDAR CALL ON 08-02-2022 @ 1:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cruz Ileana; Peter Cam as Tax Collector for Miami-Dade County Florida; Garcia Pedro J Property Appraiser; Cam Peter (Tax Collector)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Case Management Report; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to File; Event Type: Event; Comments: CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: BENZOL PROPERTIES CORP. Parties: Benzol Properties Corp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990063AMT PAID:$395.00NAME:BLOCK, JASON R100 SE 2ND ST STE 2900MIAMI FL 33131-2119COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3103-CIRCUIT CROSS CLAI1$395.00$395.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$395.00RECEIPT DATE:07/23/2021REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Counter Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Benzol Properties Corp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120335AMT PAID:$13.00NAME:BONZON-KEENAN, GERALDINE TERESA111 NW 1ST ST STE 2800MIAMI FL 33128-1930COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3142-RECORDING FEE1$8.00$8.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$13.00RECEIPT DATE:07/10/2021REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32626:802; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070551AMT PAID:$414.00NAME:BONZON-KEENAN, GERALDINE TERESA111 NW 1ST ST STE 2800MIAMI FL 33128-1930COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003142-RECORDING FEE1$8.00$8.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$414.00RECEIPT DATE:07/09/2021REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32609:1267; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less