This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/13/2022 at 21:06:16 (UTC).

PEAK HEALTH & BUSINESS SOLUTIONS (LLC) VS ALLSTATE INS CO

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 PEAK HEALTH BUSINESS SOLUTIONS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE INS CO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Peak Health & Business Solutions (LLC)

Peak Chiropractic Spine & Headache Center

Assignor

Reid, Deulson

Defendant

Allstate Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Estevez, Marisol

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/23/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

11/23/2021 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

11/23/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

11/23/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

11/23/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

11/23/2021 - Notice of Appearance

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/20/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/28/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

01/05/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Order Setting CM Deadline

01/12/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Allstate Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Allstate Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2930052AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/28/2021REGISTER#:293CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110568AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:11/24/2021REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEAK CHIROPRACTIC SPINE AND HEADACHE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Estevez, Marisol