This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/26/2022 at 13:47:46 (UTC).

PAULO LONDRA VS CRISTIAN ANDRES SALAZAR ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 PAULO LONDRA filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CRISTIAN ANDRES SALAZAR. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LONDRA, PAULO

Defendants

DOES 1-10

OVY ON THE DRUMS

Salazar, Cristian Andres

Oviedo, Daniel Echavarria

Big Ligas, LLC

GREENBERG, MATTHEW

RITHOLZ LEVY FIELDS LLP

Chopurian, Stephanie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Isaac J Mitrani

Bitran, Daniel S.

Sammataro, James G

Defendant Attorneys

Colvin, Jeremy Michael

Lloyd R Schwed

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Production

12/04/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/06/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Motion:

04/28/2020 - Motion:

Notice of Interrogatory

12/08/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/24/2020 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Motion for Extension of Time

11/27/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

11/20/2020 - Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

Order to Consolidate

06/06/2020 - Order to Consolidate

Notice of Hearing-

10/19/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Order:

02/23/2022 - Order:

Order:

12/15/2021 - Order:

Order to Take Action

12/10/2021 - Order to Take Action

Notice of Appearance

07/02/2020 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/30/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/30/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/30/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Mediators Report

06/25/2020 - Mediators Report

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/24/2020 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

163 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: 3RD DCA ORDER RECOGNIZING APPELLANT'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DIRECTING CLERK OF COURTS TO CLOSE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Order by Jury; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to Take Action; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURTS TO CLOSE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RETURNING OF EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Dismissal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Trial Minutes; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Case Management Conference; Hearing Code: CMC; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Case Management Conference; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: INTERIM CMC REGARDING TRIAL DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
153 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF WITHDRAWAL OF VERIFIED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Big Ligas LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3610037AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ISAAC J MITRANI301 W 41ST ST PHMIAMI BEACH FL 33140-3646COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/14/2020REGISTER#:361CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3590056AMT PAID:$501.00NAME:ISAAC J MITRANI301 W 41ST ST PHMIAMI BEACH FL 33140-3646COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003176-NON-FLA ATTORNEY F1$100.00$100.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$501.00RECEIPT DATE:03/11/2020REGISTER#:359CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Pro Hac Vice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIG LIGAS, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWED, LLOYD RAYMOND

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colvin, Jeremy Michael