This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/22/2021 at 01:34:32 (UTC).

PATRICIA E MILLS ET AL VS AISIN U.S.A. MFG., INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 PATRICIA E MILLS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AISIN U S A MFG , INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC

AKEBONO BRAKE CORPORATION

NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY, INC.

SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.

MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC.

CONTINENTAL TIRE THE AMERICAS, LLC

CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, INC.

MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC

AISIN U.S.A. MFG., INC.

AKEBONO BRAKE INDUSTRY CO., LTD

MORSE TEC LLC

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES U.S.A., INC.

TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION

NISSHINBO HOLDINGS, INC.

LUK CLUTCH SYSTEMS, LLC

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

TMD FRICTION, INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Cachaldora, Amanda Rae

Ferguson, Timothy J.

Smith, Melville S

Kibbe, Rebecca C

Melaragno, Peter Joseph

Edward J Briscoe

Rudock, Robert J

Collings, Christopher James More

Pazos, Lucia Veronica

Anthony N Upshaw

Other Attorneys

Garcia, Daniel Alberto

Besserman, Dawn M

Shapiro, Ari Chaim

Chris N Kolos

NUZUM, JANNA M

Horn, Hanson D., ESQ

Beck, Christopher T.

Greene, Mark C

Medina, Eduardo J.

Lopez, Frances

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Response to Motion

09/10/2021 - Response to Motion

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/09/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Answer to Amended Complaint

06/10/2021 - Answer to Amended Complaint

Answer and Affirmative Defense

06/09/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion to Dismiss

04/29/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Production

04/13/2021 - Notice of Production

Answer and Affirmative Defense

04/13/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion:

04/06/2021 - Motion:

Notice of Appearance

04/02/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Affidavit of:

03/31/2021 - Affidavit of:

Affidavit of:

03/31/2021 - Affidavit of:

Notice of Appearance

03/24/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

03/30/2021 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/23/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/17/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/17/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/17/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/17/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

320 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Video Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT, NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT, PEP BOYS, MANNY, MOE, & JACK, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: STATEMENT OF KEITH MILLS VIA SECURED SHARE-FILE LINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF WITHDRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer to Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SUMITOMO ELECTRIC U S A INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 09/17/2021 AT 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
376 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TMD FRICTION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LUK CLUTCH SYSTEMS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant