This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/18/2022 at 04:31:57 (UTC).

PATH MEDICAL, LLC VS STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 PATH MEDICAL, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Path Medical, LLC

Assignor

Bernard, Deja

Defendant

Steadfast Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C Daly

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/13/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/13/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/14/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/20/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

02/01/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Order Setting CM Deadline

02/08/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Steadfast Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030049AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/20/2022REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000114AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:01/14/2022REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Steadfast Insurance Company aso H & M Hennes & Ma is a litigant

Latest cases where Path Medical LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daly, John C, Jr.