This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/12/2022 at 14:25:59 (UTC).

PATH MEDICAL LLC VS STAR & SHIELD INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 PATH MEDICAL LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STAR SHIELD INSURANCE EXCHANGE. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Path Medical LLC

Assignor

Love, Brenda

Defendant

Star & Shield Insurance Exchange

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

Defendant Attorneys

Orlando Brittany L

Tuttle, Jody Alta

 

Court Documents

Exhibit List

06/02/2020 - Exhibit List

Notice of Interrogatory

06/02/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

06/02/2020 - Request for Production

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/24/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Interrogatory

03/30/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

AgreedOrder

06/14/2020 - AgreedOrder

Response to Request for Production

06/02/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Memorandum of Disposition

01/13/2020 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

01/13/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Voluntary Dismissal

10/21/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

Order:

10/13/2022 - Order:

Notice:

08/11/2022 - Notice:

Notice:

06/20/2022 - Notice:

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

12/01/2021 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

AgreedOrder

06/14/2020 - AgreedOrder

Notice of Interrogatory

06/02/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

06/02/2020 - Request for Production

Response to Request for Production

06/02/2020 - Response to Request for Production

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33445:4591; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3570030AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREGORY E GUDINLANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2CSUNRISE FL 33323COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/16/2019REGISTER#:357CASHIER:DVEGA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Star & Shield Insurance Exchange

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3530015AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:GREGORY E GUDINLANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2CSUNRISE FL 33323COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:10/10/2019REGISTER#:353CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Star & Shield Insurance Exchange is a litigant

Latest cases where Path Medical LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Orlando, Brittany Lyn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUTTLE ESQ, JODY