This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/26/2021 at 02:37:07 (UTC).

PATH MEDICAL, LLC VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/06/2020 PATH MEDICAL, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATH MEDICAL, LLC

Assignor

Baptiste, Leinz

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/06/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/06/2020 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

05/28/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Service of Process

08/03/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Motion:

08/06/2020 - Motion:

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

08/12/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Interrogatory

08/13/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

08/13/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

08/13/2020 - Request for Admissions

Email Notice:

08/13/2020 - Email Notice:

Answer and Affirmative Defense

09/03/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Response to Request for Admissions

09/11/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

09/11/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

09/11/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Privilege Log

09/11/2020 - Privilege Log

Notice of Filing:

09/23/2020 - Notice of Filing:

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: Caleb Courtroom 2-2 5400 N.W. 22nd Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EFILINGS@PIP-LAWYERS.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2250173AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570003AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event; Comments: $2500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Path Medical LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.