This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/17/2020 at 03:48:02 (UTC).

PATH MEDICAL, LLC VS PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 PATH MEDICAL, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATH MEDICAL, LLC

Assignor

Natson, Midlyn

Defendant

PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

 

Court Documents

Statement of Claim

09/24/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/24/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-5 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2110028AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/09/2020 REGISTER#:211CASHIER:MARTHAV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2710110AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less