This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/05/2020 at 19:44:53 (UTC).

PATH MEDICAL LLC VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 PATH MEDICAL LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Path Medical LLC

Assignor

Johnson, Sterling

Defendant

Infinity Auto Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

Defendant Attorney

Pino, Luis E

 

Court Documents

Supplemental Request to Produce

02/10/2020 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Statement of Claim

10/09/2019 - Statement of Claim

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

01/13/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Request for Admissions

02/10/2020 - Request for Admissions

Witness and Exhibit List

02/10/2020 - Witness and Exhibit List

Motion for Leave

02/10/2020 - Motion for Leave

Supplemental Request to Produce

02/10/2020 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Pre Trial Summons

10/16/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Service of Process

01/03/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness and Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion in Limine; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2800016AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/16/2019 REGISTER#:280CASHIER:IRIARTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3630017AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Path Medical LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.