This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/15/2019 at 22:03:54 (UTC).

PATH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. VS WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 PATH MEDICAL CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATH MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

Assignor

KATTHIA GEDEON

Defendant

WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Landau, Todd

Gregory E Gudin Esq. at Landau & Associates PA

Landau Esq., Todd Andrew

Defendant Attorney

Triana, Jeremy, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Order of Dismissal

04/10/2019 - Order of Dismissal

Motion to Dismiss

04/05/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Motion for Attorneys Fees

04/05/2019 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Notice:

04/03/2019 - Notice:

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/29/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Affidavit of Lost Instrument

03/27/2019 - Affidavit of Lost Instrument

Demand for Jury Trial

03/21/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

Memorandum of Disposition

03/15/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Pre Trial Summons

01/14/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

01/04/2019 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 31409:421; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTED Parties: WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Lost Instrument; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3380067AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:LANDAU, TODD 1619 NW 136TH AVE STE# 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3360356AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:LANDAU, TODD 1619 NW 136TH AVE STE# 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Path Medical Center Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Windhaven Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Landau, Todd A