This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/08/2021 at 12:03:53 (UTC).

PARTNERS FOR PAYMENT RELIEF DE II LLC VS MIRZA ALZUGARAY ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 PARTNERS FOR PAYMENT RELIEF DE II LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MIRZA ALZUGARAY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARTNERS FOR PAYMENT RELIEF DE II LLC

Defendants

ALZUGARAY, MIRZA

MOORS MASTER MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION INC (THE)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Duggar, Esq.

 

Court Documents

Order Setting CM Deadline

11/03/2021 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice of Filing:

10/28/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Lis Pendens

05/26/2021 - Lis Pendens

Notice of Hearing-

10/18/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Order of Default

09/14/2021 - Order of Default

Notice of Hearing-

08/19/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

08/16/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney's Fees

08/16/2021 - Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney's Fees

Affidavit for Atty Fee and Costs

08/16/2021 - Affidavit for Atty Fee and Costs

Motion for Summary Judgment

08/16/2021 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Non-Military Affidavit

07/27/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default

07/27/2021 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

07/21/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

07/21/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

07/21/2021 - Service Returned

Summons Returned - No Service

07/21/2021 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

07/21/2021 - Summons Returned - No Service

Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

07/12/2021 - Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FORSUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT IN FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event; Comments: SEE ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FORSUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT IN FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTED.AND AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1. Parties: ALZUGARAY MIRZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2590045AMT PAID:$410.00NAME:JASON DUGGAR, ESQ.GHIDOTTI BERGER LLP 1031 N MIAMI BEACH BLVDNORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33162COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$410.00RECEIPT DATE:05/27/2021REGISTER#:259CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32541:4692; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MOORS MASTER MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Partners For Payment Relief DE III LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Duggar, Jason