Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/12/2019 at 17:41:37 (UTC).

PANAMERICAN HEALTH CENTER, INC VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 PANAMERICAN HEALTH CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PANAMERICAN HEALTH CENTER, INC

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

RAMON REYES, EMILIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katiana B Fleites

Defendant Attorney

Robinson, Patrice S

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

06/07/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Order Extending Time for

05/03/2019 - Order Extending Time for

Letter of Correspondence

04/25/2019 - Letter of Correspondence

Memorandum of Disposition

03/19/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Filing:

03/19/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Email Notice:

03/13/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

01/25/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/25/2019 - Request for Production

Statement of Claim

01/23/2019 - Statement of Claim

Motion for Extension of Time

04/05/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order:

03/19/2019 - Order:

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/19/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

03/15/2019 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

03/13/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Pre Trial Summons

02/07/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Email Notice:

01/25/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice of Taking Deposition

01/25/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Request for Admissions

01/25/2019 - Request for Admissions

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31477:2191; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: PIP SCHEDULING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480005AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:KATIANA B FLEITES 1800 SW 27TH AVENUE, SUITE 500 MIAMI FL 33145 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PANAMERICAN HEALTH CENTER, INC, is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katiana B Fleites