Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/21/2021 at 17:49:26 (UTC).

PALMETTO LAKES THERAPY & REHABILITATION CENTER INC VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 PALMETTO LAKES THERAPY REHABILITATION CENTER INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALMETTO LAKES THERAPY & REHABILITATION CENTER INC

Assignor

Baranov, George

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

 

Court Documents

Pre Trial Summons

05/04/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

04/13/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/13/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-0 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2290083AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/04/2021 REGISTER#:229CASHIER:MARTHAV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial New Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2590074AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/14/2021 REGISTER#:259CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALMETTO LAKES THERAPY & REHABILITATION CENTER, IN is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.