Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/10/2021 at 10:14:57 (UTC).

PALMETTO LAKES THERAPY & REHABILITATION CENTER INC VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 PALMETTO LAKES THERAPY REHABILITATION CENTER INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALMETTO LAKES THERAPY & REHABILITATION CENTER INC

Assignor

Mcleod, Keytwanna

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

Defendant Attorney

Quintero, Rebeca

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance

06/01/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/26/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Pre Trial Summons

05/03/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

04/13/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/13/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2170048AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/04/2021 REGISTER#:217CASHIER:DYROFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2650015AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/14/2021 REGISTER#:265CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALMETTO LAKES THERAPY & REHABILITATION CENTER, IN is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Quintero, Rebeca