Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/18/2021 at 11:57:03 (UTC).

PALMERO, RICHARD R VS ROMERO, DAYANA M

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 PALMERO, RICHARD R filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ROMERO, DAYANA M. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Palmero, Richard R

Defendant

Department of Revenue

Respondent

Romero, Dayana M

Minors

Palmero, Katherine

Palmero Romero, Katherine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gil, Francis R.

Respondent Attorney

Mesa, Alexandra A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Appointment; Hearing Code: SPECAPPT; Hearing Time: 12:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Appointment; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF - TIMESHARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion; Hearing Code: MOTION; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion; Hearing Code: MOTION; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 30, 2021 AT 12:30 P.M. ON PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF-TIMESHARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PETITIONER'S OBJECTION TO RESPONDENT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON-PARTY WITHOUT DEPOSITION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 6/22/21 AT 10 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 6/22/21 AT 10 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Continuance; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPONDENT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: JUNE 30, 2021 AT 12:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2610050AMT PAID:$301.00 NAME:GIL, FRANCIS R. 1041 IVES DAIRY RD STE 238 MIAMI FL 33179-2539 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$301.00$301.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$301.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/17/2021 REGISTER#:261CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Department of Revenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Romero Dayana M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) ESummons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) ESummons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Petitioner - Child Custody Jurisdiction; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event; Comments: NO RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gil, Francis R.