This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/08/2019 at 18:41:03 (UTC).

PALM BEACH PHYSICAL MEDICINE VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 PALM BEACH PHYSICAL MEDICINE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Palm Beach Physical Medicine

Assignor

Cutler, Michael

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thayer Musa

Defendant Attorney

Lasaga, Vivian, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unavailability/absence

06/04/2019 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/28/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Response to Request for Production

03/08/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

03/08/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Memorandum of Disposition

03/04/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

03/01/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Notice of Interrogatory

02/19/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

02/19/2019 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

02/19/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Appearance

02/19/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Service Returned

02/13/2019 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

01/29/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Request for Admissions

01/14/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

01/14/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice:

01/14/2019 - Notice:

Request for Production

01/14/2019 - Request for Production

Statement of Claim

01/14/2019 - Statement of Claim

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2180055AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$530.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/29/2019 REGISTER#:218CASHIER:MONICAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3540065AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:THAYER MUSA 9008 SW 152ND ST PALMETTO BAY FL 33157 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00 RECEIPT DAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less