This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/10/2019 at 07:20:43 (UTC).

PALM BEACH PHYSICAL MEDICINE VS 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 PALM BEACH PHYSICAL MEDICINE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Palm Beach Physical Medicine

Assignor

Artyy, Gaelle

Defendant

21st Century Centennial Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thayer Musa

Defendant Attorney

Parrales, Julio, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

07/09/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Unavailability/absence

05/17/2019 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Motion for Extension of Time

03/22/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/04/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

03/05/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Memorandum of Disposition

03/04/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

03/01/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Service Returned

02/13/2019 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

01/29/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Email Notice:

01/14/2019 - Email Notice:

Request for Admissions

01/14/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

01/14/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/14/2019 - Request for Production

Statement of Claim

01/14/2019 - Statement of Claim

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31524:2149; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketService Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2180051AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$530.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/29/2019 REGISTER#:218CASHIER:MONICAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3540060AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:THAYER MUSA 9008 SW 152ND ST PALMETTO BAY FL 33157 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: MUSAPLEADINGS@GMAIL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 99.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.