This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/29/2020 at 10:13:01 (UTC).

PAIGE, JUSTIN C. VS PAIGE, DEVIN LAUREL

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 PAIGE, JUSTIN C filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PAIGE, DEVIN LAUREL. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PAIGE, JUSTIN C.

Respondent

PAIGE, DEVIN LAUREL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Vilar, Patrick

Respondent Attorneys

Vova, Cindy S.

Schurr, Richard A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order for Substitution of Counsel; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Mediation Conference; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: HUSBAND S NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE TO WIFE S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR RETURN OF PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXTENDING STATUS QUO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Cancellation Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: DATED FOR 02/18/2020 @ 1000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Mediation Conference; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2-18-20 10AM ELLEN D SILVERS ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Modify; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Paige Devin Laurel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580071AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:VILAR, PATRICK 66 W FLAGLER ST STE 500 MIAMI FL 33130-1879 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) ESummons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510024AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:VILAR, PATRICK 66 W FLAGLER ST STE 500 MIAMI FL 33130-1879 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$409.00 RE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing and Serving Administrative Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.