Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/10/2019 at 05:40:57 (UTC).

ORTHOPEDIC TRAUMATOLOGY & REHAB CENTER,INC. VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 ORTHOPEDIC TRAUMATOLOGY REHAB CENTER,INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTHOPEDIC TRAUMATOLOGY & REHAB CENTER,INC.

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

PINAR, JANET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carla C. Martinez

Defendant Attorney

Plunkett, Kimberly A

 

Court Documents

Motion for Protective Order

04/05/2019 - Motion for Protective Order

Order:

03/05/2019 - Order:

Memorandum of Disposition

03/05/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

03/04/2019 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Statement of Claim

01/17/2019 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

01/30/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Request for Admissions

01/17/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

01/17/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

01/17/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion for Attorneys Fees

03/11/2019 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Notice of Filing:

02/27/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/05/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice:

03/04/2019 - Notice:

Motion for Summary Judgment

02/27/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Service of Process

02/13/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice:

01/17/2019 - Notice:

Request for Production

01/17/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Production

01/17/2019 - Request for Production

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Protective Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: PIP SCHEDULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3590010AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:CARLA C. MARTINEZ 2601 SOUTH BAYSHORE DRIVE 18TH FLOOR COCONUT GOVE FL 33133 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORTHOPEDIC TRAUMATOLOGY & REHAB CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carla C. Martinez