*************P-24
02/22/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Miami-Dade, Florida
ORLANDO WELLNESS CENTER, INC.
DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY,
Mozo Lao, Aidelin
White, T Roger, Jr
02/22/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
02/22/2023 - Statement of Claim
02/27/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements
03/03/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
03/06/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued
03/14/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory
03/14/2023 - Request for Admissions
03/14/2023 - Request for Production
03/23/2023 - Notice of Service of Process
DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3230008AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:WHITE, T ROGER, JR.9999 NE 2ND AVE STE 306MIAMI SHORES FL 33138-2346COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/07/2023REGISTER#:323CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3200014AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:WHITE, T ROGER, JR.9999 NE 2ND AVE STE 306MIAMI SHORES FL 33138-2346COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:02/23/2023REGISTER#:320CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event
[-] Read Less