This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/15/2021 at 08:42:22 (UTC).

ORIANA CURVELO VS XILUET PLASTIC SURGERY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 ORIANA CURVELO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against XILUET PLASTIC SURGERY INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Curvelo, Oriana

Defendants

Xiluet Plastic Surgery Inc

Hammoudeh (MD), Ziyad

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Koltun, Dennis A.

Defendant Attorneys

Kubs Lalchandani

Diaz, Rolando A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unavailability/absence

08/26/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Voluntary Dismissal

05/12/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

05/12/2021 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Voluntary Dismissal

05/12/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Hearing-

05/05/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Dismiss

05/05/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Hearing-

04/19/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Dismiss

04/15/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

04/15/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

Service Returned

04/04/2021 - Service Returned

Notice of Appearance

04/02/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Service Returned

03/24/2021 - Service Returned

Notice of Filing:

03/12/2021 - Notice of Filing:

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/12/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/12/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/10/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/10/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Production

03/02/2021 - Request for Production

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32505:1845; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Xiluet Plastic Surgery Inc; Hammoudeh (MD) Ziyad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 05/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Kubs Lalchandani; Xiluet Plastic Surgery Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: MAY 13, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Diaz Rolando A; Hammoudeh (MD) Ziyad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Diaz Rolando A; Hammoudeh (MD) Ziyad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Hammoudeh (MD) Ziyad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2560134AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:KOLTUN, DENNIS A.2601 S BAYSHORE DR STE 200COCONUT GROVE FL 33133COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:03/11/2021REGISTER#:256CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2690214AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:KOLTUN, DENNIS A.2601 S BAYSHORE DR STE 200COCONUT GROVE FL 33133COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:03/03/2021REGISTER#:269CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kubs Lalchandani

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diaz, Rolando Andres