This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/10/2020 at 16:36:13 (UTC).

OPTIMUS U.S. 801 NW 47TH AVE, LLC ET AL VS KRISIA DEL PRADO ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 OPTIMUS U S 801 NW 47TH AVE, LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against KRISIA DEL PRADO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Optimus U.S. 10350 West Bay Harbor Dr., LLC

Optimus U.S. 941 NE 169th Street, LLC

Optimus U.S. 4550 NW 9th Street, LLC

Sun Investments of Miami Beach I, LLC

Optimus U.S. 1655 West 44th Place, LLC

Optimus U.S. 801 NW 47th Ave, LLC

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

del Prado, Krisia

Westland Plumbing Septic, Corp

Diaz, Alberto

OBOB Enterprises, LLC

Grace Property Investments, Inc.

Del Junco, Maria Cristina

3Rd Party Defendant

MENDEZ, STRAVOULA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Dimond, Scott M

Lassel, Simon M

Pruss, Lorenzo M

Defendant Attorneys

Perez, Joaquin

Ramirez, Juan

Lindsey, Harold Eugene, III

Ponton, Danise

Medel, Maria E.

 

Court Documents

Response to Order to Show Cause

06/19/2020 - Response to Order to Show Cause

Notice of Hearing-

05/29/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Evidence Submission

05/28/2020 - Evidence Submission

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

05/28/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Certificate of No Objections to Production

05/08/2020 - Certificate of No Objections to Production

Motion to Compel

04/15/2020 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Service of Process

03/16/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Motion for Default

03/14/2020 - Motion for Default

Subpoena

03/09/2020 - Subpoena

Notice of Service of Process

03/06/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Subpoena Returned

02/27/2020 - Subpoena Returned

Order:

02/25/2020 - Order:

Order:

02/25/2020 - Order:

Notice of Taking Deposition

02/18/2020 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Filing:

02/03/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Order of Transfer (jud Sect Chg) Section:

12/20/2019 - Order of Transfer (jud Sect Chg) Section:

Request for Production

11/18/2019 - Request for Production

Motion:

11/18/2019 - Motion:

214 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Dimond Scott M; MENDEZ STRAVOULA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING DEF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDING FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE 10-02-20 @ 9:00 & 10-26-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Order to Show Cause; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING PLTFS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
265 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3600370AMT PAID:$403.50 NAME:DIMOND, SCOTT M 2665 S BAYSHORE DR # PH-2B MIAMI FL 33133-5448 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$2.50$2.50 TE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR PRE JUDGEMENT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR PRE JUDGEMENT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR PRE JUDGEMENT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.