This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/13/2023 at 06:06:18 (UTC).

OPA LOCKA HOUSING (LP) VS DONNA RIDDICK

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 OPA LOCKA HOUSING LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DONNA RIDDICK. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Opa Locka Housing (LP)

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

Riddick, Donna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fell, Brian David

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/14/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

04/14/2022 - Complaint

Service Returned

04/20/2022 - Service Returned

Settlement Agreement

05/02/2022 - Settlement Agreement

Order of Dismissal

05/09/2022 - Order of Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33179:330; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Riddick Donna

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Riddick Donna

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2380008AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/19/2022REGISTER#:238CASHIER:ELIZABE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Riddick Donna

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160079AMT PAID:$185.00NAME:FELL, BRIAN DAVID135 SAN LORENZO AVE STE 650CORAL GABLES FL 33146-1526COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$185.00RECEIPT DATE:04/15/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less