This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/24/2023 at 09:11:36 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC VS GRISELDA RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GRISELDA RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

as servicer for ASF Wilmington Trust NA

as Issuer Loan Trustee for OneMain

Defendant

RAMIREZ, GRISELDA

Homestead, FL 33032

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Lobello III

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/22/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

12/22/2022 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

12/30/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

Summons Returned - No Service

02/08/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Memorandum of Disposition

02/15/2023 - Memorandum of Disposition

Pre Trial Summons

03/08/2023 - Pre Trial Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-0 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2440041AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/08/2023REGISTER#:244CASHIER:MAYRAES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: RAMIREZ GRISELDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-0 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2260053AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/30/2022REGISTER#:226CASHIER:GARCIAJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: RAMIREZ GRISELDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080092AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:THOMAS LOBELLO IIIP O BOX 4400JACKSONVILLE FL 32201COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:12/23/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less