This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/26/2023 at 14:41:08 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY CO VS KEYMIKO LEE

Case Summary

On 02/20/2023 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY CO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KEYMIKO LEE. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC a limited liability co

Defendant

LEE, KEYMIKO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amanda Rolfe Tise

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/20/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

02/20/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/22/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/22/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

02/27/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/06/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/06/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: LEE KEYMIKO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: LEE KEYMIKO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180125AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:AMANDA ROLFE TISEP.O. BOX 4400JACKSONVILLE FL 32201-4400COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/02/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180124AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:AMANDA ROLFE TISEP.O. BOX 4400JACKSONVILLE FL 32201-4400COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/02/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100261AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:AMANDA ROLFE TISEP.O. BOX 4400JACKSONVILLE FL 32201-4400COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:02/22/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $50000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less