This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/12/2023 at 10:25:41 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY CO VS KARLA P LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 01/18/2023 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY CO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KARLA P LOPEZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC a limited liability CO

Defendants

LOPEZ, KARLA P

Miami, FL 33130

LOPEZ, KARLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amanda Rolfe Tise

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/18/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/18/2023 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

01/27/2023 - Pre Trial Summons

Summons Returned - No Service

02/24/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

02/27/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2110067AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/27/2023REGISTER#:211CASHIER:FERGUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: LOPEZ KARLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150035AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:AMANDA ROLFE TISEP.O. BOX 4400JACKSONVILLE FL 32201-4400COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:01/20/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less