This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/06/2021 at 10:01:46 (UTC).

ONE BISCAYNE TOWER, LLC VS SPANISH BROADCASTING SYSTEM OF FLORIDA, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 ONE BISCAYNE TOWER, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SPANISH BROADCASTING SYSTEM OF FLORIDA, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

One Biscayne Tower, LLC

Defendant

Spanish Broadcasting System of Florida, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin, Shane Patrick

Defendant Attorney

Sammataro, James G

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/21/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

08/21/2020 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/25/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/27/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

09/03/2020 - Service Returned

Notice of Appearance

09/23/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Motion to Dismiss

10/01/2020 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

10/08/2020 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Response to Motion

11/27/2020 - Response to Motion

Notice:

12/02/2020 - Notice:

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

12/03/2020 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Answer and Affirmative Defense

12/18/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

FWOP Notice

10/19/2021 - FWOP Notice

Request for Production

10/31/2021 - Request for Production

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 11:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: FWOP; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: FWOP Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: 01/04/2022 AT 11:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 12-04-20 @ 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Spanish Broadcasting System of Florida Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Spanish Broadcasting System of Florida Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2640163AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:MARTIN, SHANE PATRICK 2 S BISCAYNE BLVD MIAMI FL 33131-1806 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/27/2020 REGISTER#:264CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2620286AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:MARTIN, SHANE PATRICK 2 S BISCAYNE BLVD MIAMI FL 33131-1806 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/22/2020 REGISTER#:262CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where One Biscayne Tower LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin, Shane Patrick