This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/24/2023 at 08:06:19 (UTC).

OLD REPUBLIC NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY VS LUIS RENE DESCHOUDEN SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 OLD REPUBLIC NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LUIS RENE DESCHOUDEN SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLD REPUBLIC NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SANCHEZ, LUIS RENE DESCHOUDEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas L Avrutis

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/30/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/30/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/31/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/31/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Summons Returned - No Service

02/10/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/28/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Amended Complaint

05/03/2023 - Amended Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/03/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: SANCHEZ LUIS RENE DESCHOUDEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160099AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:THOMAS L AVRUTISPO BOX 4137SARASOTA FL 34230-4137COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/05/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140193AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:THOMAS L AVRUTISPO BOX 4137SARASOTA FL 34230-4137COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/01/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140035AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:THOMAS L AVRUTISPO BOX 4137SARASOTA FL 34230-4137COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:02/01/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 3. Parties: SANCHEZ LUIS RENE DESCHOUDEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less