This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/19/2020 at 01:11:20 (UTC).

OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INS CO VS ELIZABETH RAMOS

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INS CO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ELIZABETH RAMOS. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ocean Harbor Casualty Ins Co

Defendant

Ramos, Elizabeth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Flores, Oscar Alberto

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing-

11/26/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Letter of Correspondence

01/24/2020 - Letter of Correspondence

Motion for Change of Venue

10/21/2019 - Motion for Change of Venue

Order Granting Telephonic Hearing

11/26/2019 - Order Granting Telephonic Hearing

Text

01/30/2020 - Text

Receipt for File

01/24/2020 - Receipt for File

Amended Notice of Hearing

11/26/2019 - Amended Notice of Hearing

Service Returned

10/15/2019 - Service Returned

Notice of Hearing-

11/26/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Text

11/27/2019 - Text

Memorandum of Disposition

01/22/2020 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order of Transfer (Change of Venue)

01/22/2020 - Order of Transfer (Change of Venue)

Statement of Claim

09/18/2019 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

09/25/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Motion for Telephonic Hearing

11/26/2019 - Motion for Telephonic Hearing

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT FOR FILE RECEIVED BY SOUTH DADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLEASE DO NOT FILE ANYMORE PLEADINGS IN THIS CASE. NEW CASE NUMBER IS 2020-1034-SP-26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt for File; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: SENT TO PARTIES WITH NEW SOUTH DADE CASE NUMBER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Info: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Order of Transfer (Change of Venue); Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Transfer (Change of Venue); Book/Page: 31793:649; Event Type: Event; Comments: SOUTH DADE Parties: Ramos Elizabeth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE FILED 11. 21. 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTES: FROM JUDGE MEDINA/ MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ON 10-21-19. NEED TO BE SET IN FRONT OF JUDGE STEIN AND DEFENDANT MAY APPEAR BY PHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: North Dade Justice Center Courtroom 2-7 15555 Biscayne Blvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Change of Venue; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: FILED W/CONFORMED COPY OF SUMMONS INSTEAD OF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2220024AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/26/2019 REGISTER#:222CASHIER:BELKISG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ramos Elizabeth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520047AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:FLORES, OSCAR ALBERTO 11555 HERON BAY BLVD STE 100A CORAL SPRINGS FL 33076-3304 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $2077.65

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.