This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/11/2022 at 20:56:05 (UTC).

OCEAN CHIROPRACTIC AND HEALTH CENTER VS FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 OCEAN CHIROPRACTIC AND HEALTH CENTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ocean Chiropractic And Health Center

Defendant

Foremost Property And Casualty Insurance Company

Assignee

Hill, Maggie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Fischetti

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/21/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/21/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/24/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/25/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

01/28/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Voluntary Dismissal

02/01/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33007:3911; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Foremost Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Foremost Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030149AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MICHAEL FISCHETTIFISCHETTI LAW GROUP MICHAEL J FISCHETTI, ESQ 7593BOYNTON BEACH FL 33437COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/26/2022REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Foremost Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970319AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:MICHAEL FISCHETTIFISCHETTI LAW GROUP MICHAEL J FISCHETTI, ESQ 7593BOYNTON BEACH FL 33437COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:01/22/2022REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where OCEAN CHIROPRACTIC AND HEALTH CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fischetti, Michael