This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/30/2023 at 03:26:37 (UTC).

NTL CARE, LLC VS SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 NTL CARE, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NTL CARE, LLC

Defendant

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

MARCELLUS, EVENS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Greg Blackburn

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/30/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/30/2023 - Statement of Claim

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/31/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Amended Statement of Claim

02/01/2023 - Amended Statement of Claim

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

04/10/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160059AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREG BLACKBURN3333 W COMMERCIAL BLVD STE 200BFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/02/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160010AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:GREG BLACKBURN3333 W COMMERCIAL BLVD STE 200BFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:01/31/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less