This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/24/2023 at 06:43:28 (UTC).

NTL CARE, LLC VS PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 NTL CARE, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NTL CARE, LLC

Defendant

PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Assignee

HAWTHORNE, DANNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Greg Blackburn

Defendant Attorney

Ava Mahmoudi

 

Court Documents

Notice of Interrogatory

06/28/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

06/28/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

06/28/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Supplemental Request to Produce

06/28/2023 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Supplemental Request to Produce

06/28/2023 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Supplemental Request to Produce

06/28/2023 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

06/28/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

06/28/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

06/28/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

06/28/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

06/28/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

06/28/2023 - Request for Admissions

Motion for Leave

06/28/2023 - Motion for Leave

Motion for Leave

06/28/2023 - Motion for Leave

Demand for Jury Trial

06/21/2023 - Demand for Jury Trial

Motion for Extension of Time

06/21/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

06/21/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

06/07/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3240364AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREG BLACKBURN3333 W COMMERCIAL BLVD STE 200BFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/04/2023REGISTER#:324CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090610AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:GREG BLACKBURN3333 W COMMERCIAL BLVD STE 200BFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:01/31/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less