Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/21/2021 at 00:15:49 (UTC).

NOVA MEDICAL CENTER, INC. VS ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 NOVA MEDICAL CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-25

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Coral Gables District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOVA MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

Assignor

Hernandez, Freddy

Defendant

ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pacin, Marc David

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

05/13/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/13/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/12/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

04/08/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/08/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32509:624; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2610059AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:PACIN, MARC DAVID PACIN LEVINE, P.A. 1150 NW 72 AVE, STE 600 MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/14/2021 REGISTER#:261CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2630135AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:PACIN, MARC DAVID PACIN LEVINE, P.A. 1150 NW 72 AVE, STE 600 MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/10/2021 REGISTER#:263CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event; Comments: $15,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOVA MEDICAL CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pacin, Marc David