Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/25/2021 at 21:28:08 (UTC).

NORTHSIDE CENTRE, LLC VS FOOT LOCKER RETAIL, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/29/2020 NORTHSIDE CENTRE, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against FOOT LOCKER RETAIL, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-20

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Joseph Caleb Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Northside Centre, LLC

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

Foot Locker Retail, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Glenn L Widom

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

07/31/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

Complaint

05/29/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/29/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32036:2096; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Foot Locker Retail Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Foot Locker Retail Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2700004AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:GLENN L WIDOM 696 NE 125TH ST NORTH MIAMI FL 33161-5546 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185.00 RECEIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Foot Locker Retail, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTHSIDE CENTRE, LLC, a Fla Limited Liability Co. is a litigant