This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/19/2019 at 08:45:42 (UTC).

NOEL, MAXENE VS SALVADOR (DECEASED), CLAUDIA

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 NOEL, MAXENE filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against SALVADOR DECEASED , CLAUDIA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Noel, Maxene

Respondent

Salvador (Deceased), Claudia

Minors

Noel, Camila

Noel, Camaya

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • Special Appointment; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Order to Appear; Event Type: Event; Comments: IN RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, SET ON 02/13/20 @ 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Special Appointment; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Family Court Services Status Report; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM MINOR CHILD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM CAMILA NOEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: PETITIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Order to Appear; Event Type: Event; Comments: 9/2/19 @ 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2019
  • Birth Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: MINOR CHILD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2430022AMT PAID:$301.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$301.00$301.00 TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:$301.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/06/2019 REGISTER#:243CASHIER:RAMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Filed at Courthouse Center; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Hearing Info: Special Appointment; Hearing Code: SPECAPPT; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Hearing Info: Special Appointment; Hearing Code: SPECAPPT; Hearing Time: 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Hearing Info: Special Appointment; Hearing Code: SPECAPPT; Hearing Time: 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Hearing Info: Uncontested Diss/CMC; Hearing Code: UCDCMC; Hearing Time: 2:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Hearing Info: Special Appointment; Hearing Code: SPECAPPT; Hearing Time: 11:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Hearing Info: Uncontest/diss; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Hearing Info: Special Appointment; Hearing Code: SPECAPPT; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less