This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 10/15/2022 at 05:32:28 (UTC).

NIMIA ALVAREZ VS CREATIVE BEAUTY GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 NIMIA ALVAREZ filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CREATIVE BEAUTY GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alvarez, Nimia

Defendant

Creative Beauty Group LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason S Remer

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/15/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/15/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/19/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/22/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Appearance

09/09/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Answer and Affirmative Defense

09/28/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Creative Beauty Group LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010030AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JASON S REMER44 W FLAGLER ST STE 2200MIAMI FL 33130-6807COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:07/22/2022REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090191AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JASON S REMER44 W FLAGLER ST STE 2200MIAMI FL 33130-6807COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:07/16/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Remer, Jason S