This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/04/2021 at 00:19:05 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC VS SHANKITA DESHANDRA HILL ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 NEWREZ LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SHANKITA DESHANDRA HILL. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEWREZ LLC

SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

Defendants

HILL, SHANKITA DESHANDRA

MARBELLA BAY HOA

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

WATERSTONE II MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

HILL, SHANKITA D

MARBELLA BAY HOA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meisels, Jonathan Ian

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/15/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/13/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/13/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/13/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/13/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Lis Pendens

10/06/2021 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/12/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

10/12/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

10/12/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/12/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/12/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

10/06/2021 - Lis Pendens

Motion:

10/06/2021 - Motion:

Complaint

10/06/2021 - Complaint

Certificate of Possession of Note

10/06/2021 - Certificate of Possession of Note

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/06/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/06/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: MARBELLA BAY HOA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13. Parties: WATERSTONE II MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: HILL SHANKITA DESHANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000326AMT PAID:$50.00 NAME:MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN ROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ, SCHNEID, CRANE & PARTNERS, PL BOCA RATON FL 33487-2853 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$50.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/13/2021 REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040238AMT PAID:$1,923.00 NAME:MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN ROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ, SCHNEID, CRANE & PARTNERS, PL BOCA RATON FL 33487-2853 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1 $1,906.00 $1,906.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$12.00$12.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$1,923.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/07/2021 REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32783:1479; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Waterstone II Master Association Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Newrez, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING is a litigant