This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/12/2022 at 16:50:54 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC VS PATRICIA C SAWYER ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 NEWREZ LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PATRICIA C SAWYER. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Newrez Llc

Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing

Defendants

Sawyer, Patricia C

Clerk Of Circuit Court Of Miami-Dade County, Flori

Keys Gate Community Association Inc

Keys Gate Condominium No Eight Association Inc

Sawyer, Patricia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kopf, Jennifer Lynn

 

Court Documents

Letter of Correspondence

09/01/2022 - Letter of Correspondence

Motion for Default

09/01/2022 - Motion for Default

Notice:

09/01/2022 - Notice:

Answer and Affirmative Defense

08/01/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Service Return for Unknown Party

07/29/2022 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Summons Returned - No Service

07/29/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

07/29/2022 - Service Returned

Service Return for Unknown Party

07/29/2022 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

07/29/2022 - Service Returned

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/05/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/05/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/05/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/05/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

07/05/2022 - Lis Pendens

Notice:

06/30/2022 - Notice:

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

06/30/2022 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Complaint

06/30/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/30/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: BLANK DEFAULT PAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF DROPPING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Keys Gate Condominium No Eight Association Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PATRICIA C SAWYER A/K/A PATRICIA SAWYER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Clerk Of Circuit Court Of Miami-Dade County Flori

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Keys Gate Community Association Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33274:852; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Keys Gate Community Association Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Newrez, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOPF, JENNIFER LYNN