This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/14/2023 at 01:10:29 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC VS EDDY SOZA ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 NEWREZ LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against EDDY SOZA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEWREZ LLC

SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

Defendants

SOZA, EDDY

SOZA, MAITE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Vanslette

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

03/21/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

Final Disposition Document

03/21/2023 - Final Disposition Document

Summons Returned - No Service

03/13/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

03/13/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

02/24/2023 - Lis Pendens

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33632:1127; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SOZA EDDY; SOZA MAITE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 14. Parties: SOZA EDDY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170195AMT PAID:$1,917.50NAME:JASON VANSLETTE10360 W STATE ROAD 84FT. LAUDERDALE FL 33324-4237COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$2.50$2.503142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,917.50RECEIPT DATE:02/25/2023REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33595:4743; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less