This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/25/2023 at 10:08:38 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC VS CARMELO MASTROELI ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 NEWREZ LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CARMELO MASTROELI. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEWREZ LLC

SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

Defendants

MASTROELI, CARMELO

MASTROELI, DAMARIS

MASTROELI, CARMELO F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Orlando De Luca

 

Court Documents

Request for Production

05/24/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Production

05/24/2023 - Request for Production

Witness and Exhibit List

05/24/2023 - Witness and Exhibit List

Certificate of Service

05/24/2023 - Certificate of Service

Witness and Exhibit List

05/23/2023 - Witness and Exhibit List

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

05/22/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Taking Deposition

05/19/2023 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

05/19/2023 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Motion for Extension of Time

05/10/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Setting Non-Jury Trial

05/17/2023 - Order Setting Non-Jury Trial

Order Denying Motion

05/14/2023 - Order Denying Motion

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

05/13/2023 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

AgreedOrder

05/12/2023 - AgreedOrder

Response to Request for Production

05/08/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

05/08/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

05/08/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/08/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Production

05/08/2023 - Request for Production

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: N/J Trials; Hearing Code: NJTRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: N/J Trials; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: FORECLOSURE NON JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness and Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness and Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Limited Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180128AMT PAID:$911.00NAME:ORLANDO DE LUCA2101 NE 26TH STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33305-1535COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$911.00RECEIPT DATE:02/24/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33593:4873; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less