This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/08/2020 at 07:44:29 (UTC).

NEWPORT UNIVERSAL GROUP CORP VS MARIA G VILLAMIZAR

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 NEWPORT UNIVERSAL GROUP CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIA G VILLAMIZAR. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWPORT UNIVERSAL GROUP CORP

Defendant

VILLAMIZAR, MARIA G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Velazquez, Lisbet, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

03/11/2020 - Memorandum of Disposition

Pre Trial Summons

02/21/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

02/13/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-0 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2820028AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/21/2020 REGISTER#:282CASHIER:DAHOBBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VILLAMIZAR MARIA G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440073AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:VELAZQUEZ, LISBET, ESQ 782 NW 42 AVE STE 639 MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 8,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.