This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/23/2019 at 17:26:45 (UTC).

NEWLIFE HEALTHCARE AND WELLNESS CENTER, INC., VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 NEWLIFE HEALTHCARE AND WELLNESS CENTER, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWLIFE HEALTHCARE AND WELLNESS CENTER, INC.,

Assignor

RAMIREZ, ALICIA

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey G. Hess

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

03/12/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Motion for Summary Judgment

02/19/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Request for Production

02/12/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Production

02/12/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Production

02/12/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/12/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing:

02/12/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/13/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Demand for Jury Trial

02/06/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Admissions

02/21/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Process

02/14/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Memorandum of Disposition

02/13/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Request for Admissions

02/12/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing:

02/12/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Waiver:

02/12/2019 - Waiver:

Pre Trial Summons

01/15/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet

01/02/2019 - Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

01/02/2019 - Statement of Claim

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31362:4687; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2190013AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/15/2019 REGISTER#:219CASHIER:ABIGAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440051AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:JOHN C LLARENA 5975 SUNSET DR STE 601 SOUTH MIAMI FL 33143-5174 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less