This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/08/2021 at 11:58:18 (UTC).

NEW VISTA DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING SVCS (LLC) VS NATIONWIDE INS CO OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 NEW VISTA DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING SVCS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NATIONWIDE INS CO OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

New Vista Diagnostic Imaging Svcs (LLC)

Assignor

Betancourt, Roberto

Defendant

Nationwide Ins Co Of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dover, Jeremy Phillip

Defendant Attorney

Wotton, Britney Nicole

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/07/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

10/07/2021 - Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

10/07/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

10/07/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

10/07/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

10/07/2021 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

10/07/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

10/07/2021 - Email Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/07/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/07/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Appearance

10/27/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Demand for Jury Trial

10/27/2021 - Demand for Jury Trial

Motion for Extension of Time

10/27/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

10/27/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Service of Process

10/29/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Nationwide Ins Co Of America

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000251AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:DOVER, JEREMY PHILLIP3920 W. BROWARD BLVDSUITE B-1FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33312COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/08/2021REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000076AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:DOVER, JEREMY PHILLIP3920 W. BROWARD BLVDSUITE B-1FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33312COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:10/08/2021REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: Nationwide Ins Co Of America

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PIP-PLEADINGS@ATTORNEYSOFTHEINJURED.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW VISTA DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationwide Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wotton, Britney Nicole