This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/19/2021 at 07:43:33 (UTC).

NEW TEAM LLC VS IRIE WEEKEND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 NEW TEAM LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against IRIE WEEKEND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

New Team LLC

TEAM ENTERPRISES

Defendant

Irie Weekend Management Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey B Pertnoy Esq

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/20/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

08/20/2020 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/25/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/27/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice:

09/09/2020 - Notice:

Notice of Appearance

09/24/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

09/24/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Answer

11/02/2020 - Answer

Motion for Summary Judgment

11/11/2020 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

11/12/2020 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

11/13/2020 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Notice of Hearing-

12/04/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Final Judgment by Judge

12/08/2020 - Final Judgment by Judge

Motion for Extension of Time

01/22/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Final Judgment by Judge

12/08/2020 - Final Judgment by Judge

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Irie Weekend Management Company LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: SRS 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 32230:698; Event Type: Event; Comments: SRS 12 Parties: Irie Weekend Management Company LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 8:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 12/29/2020 AT 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 12-04-20 @ 8:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: HEARING SET FOR 12/4/20 AT 8:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Irie Weekend Management Company LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Irie Weekend Management Company LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Irie Weekend Management Company LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Irie Weekend Management Company LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2640123AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:JEFFREY B PERTNOY ESQ 98 SE 7TH ST STE 1100 MIAMI FL 33131-3525 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/27/2020 REGISTER#:264CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2620235AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:JEFFREY B PERTNOY ESQ 98 SE 7TH ST STE 1100 MIAMI FL 33131-3525 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/22/2020 REGISTER#:262CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New Team LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TEAM ENTERPRISES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey B Pertnoy Esq