This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/06/2020 at 23:04:20 (UTC).

NEUROLOGY ASSOC GROUP INC VS WINDHAVEN INS CO

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 NEUROLOGY ASSOC GROUP INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WINDHAVEN INS CO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Neurology Assoc Group Inc

Citimed Group

Assignor

Garcia, Yaniris

Defendant

Windhaven Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward S. Weinstein, Esq.

Defendant Attorney

Klassman, Robert Lyle, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Order Placing Case On Inactive Status - Other Reason

01/28/2020 - Order Placing Case On Inactive Status - Other Reason

Notice of Filing:

01/16/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

01/07/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Motion for Extension of Time

11/25/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Answer and Affirmative Defense

11/18/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

11/05/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

11/04/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/16/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/15/2019 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Production

10/15/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

10/15/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

10/15/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

10/15/2019 - Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Placing Case On Inactive Status - Other Reason; Event Type: Event; Comments: IN RECEIVERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MANDATORY OF PROCEEDINGS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CONSENT ORDER APPOINTING THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES AS RECEIVER OF WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY FORPURPOSES OF LIQUIDATION, INJUNCTION, AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3800003AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:EDWARD S. WEINSTEIN, ESQ. 152 NE 167TH ST STE 300 MIAMI FL 33162-3425 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Windhaven Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3590170AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:EDWARD S. WEINSTEIN, ESQ. 152 NE 167TH ST STE 300 MIAMI FL 33162-3425 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $8479.23

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.