This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/25/2022 at 18:23:40 (UTC).

NEUROLOGY ASSOC GROUP INC VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 NEUROLOGY ASSOC GROUP INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neurology Assoc Group Inc

Assignor

Rocker, James

Defendant

Progressive Select Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward S. Weinstein, Esq.

Defendant Attorney

Remy, Jason, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/02/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

06/02/2022 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

06/02/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

06/02/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

06/02/2022 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/03/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/07/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

06/09/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Answer and Affirmative Defense

06/24/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/27/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Appearance

06/28/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

06/28/2022 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Notice of Filing:

08/05/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Response to Request for Admissions

08/05/2022 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

08/05/2022 - Response to Request for Production

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SERVING DFNTS ANSWERSTO PNTFS INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3210054AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:EDWARD S. WEINSTEIN, ESQ.152 NE 167TH ST STE 300MIAMI FL 33162-3425COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/08/2022REGISTER#:321CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Progressive Select Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150029AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:EDWARD S. WEINSTEIN, ESQ.152 NE 167TH ST STE 300MIAMI FL 33162-3425COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:06/04/2022REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Neurology Assoc Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward S. Weinstein, Esq.