This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/21/2022 at 15:12:03 (UTC).

NEUROLOGY ASSOC GROUP INC VS OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INS CO

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 NEUROLOGY ASSOC GROUP INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INS CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neurology Assoc Group Inc

Assignor

Hyde, Zany

Defendant

Ocean Harbor Casualty Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward S. Weinstein, Esq.

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin W. Silvanic

 

Court Documents

Statement of Claim

06/09/2022 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

06/09/2022 - Request for Production

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/09/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Request for Admissions

06/09/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

06/09/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Supplemental Request to Produce

06/22/2022 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Notice of Interrogatory

06/22/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Supplemental Request to Produce

06/22/2022 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

06/22/2022 - Request for Admissions

Motion for Summary Judgment

06/22/2022 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion:

06/22/2022 - Motion:

Motion in Limine

06/22/2022 - Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

06/22/2022 - Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

06/22/2022 - Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

06/22/2022 - Motion in Limine

Motion for Summary Judgment

06/22/2022 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion:

06/22/2022 - Motion:

Letter of Correspondence

06/22/2022 - Letter of Correspondence

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO PROHIBIT SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion in Limine; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion in Limine; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion in Limine; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion in Limine; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Ocean Harbor Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060266AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:EDWARD S. WEINSTEIN, ESQ.152 NE 167TH ST STE 300MIAMI FL 33162-3425COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/14/2022REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040345AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:EDWARD S. WEINSTEIN, ESQ.152 NE 167TH ST STE 300MIAMI FL 33162-3425COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:06/10/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Neurology Assoc Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant