This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/14/2020 at 08:05:34 (UTC).

NESTOR FERNANDEZ MDPA VS WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 NESTOR FERNANDEZ MDPA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NESTOR FERNANDEZ MDPA

Defendant

WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

Cedeno, Uberlin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gonzalez, Neil M

 

Court Documents

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

04/01/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service of Process

03/31/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Pre Trial Summons

02/21/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Amended Statement of Claim

02/17/2020 - Amended Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

02/13/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-0 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2790061AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$200.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/21/2020 REGISTER#:279CASHIER:DAVERNF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440054AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:GONZALEZ, NEIL M LAW OFFICE OF GONZALEZ & ASSOCIATES, LLC 3403 NW 8 MIAMI FL 33122 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.