This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/16/2021 at 02:54:06 (UTC).

NELSON GONZALEZ VS LUIS ENRIQUE PANISELLO ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 NELSON GONZALEZ filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against LUIS ENRIQUE PANISELLO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gonzalez, Nelson

Defendants

Panisello, Luis Enrique

Vazquez Arias, Yunia Yulit

Paramount Residential Mortgage Group Inc

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS

PENNYMAC CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Velez, Arnaldo

Defendant Attorney

Ellen M Patterson

 

Court Documents

Order:

10/15/2021 - Order:

Motion for Clarification

09/29/2021 - Motion for Clarification

Notice of Hearing-

09/21/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

09/21/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Appearance

09/17/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

09/16/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Service Returned

07/06/2021 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/29/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/29/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Motion for Extension of Time

06/18/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

06/18/2021 - Notice of Appearance

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/10/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Amended Complaint

06/10/2021 - Amended Complaint

Notice:

06/10/2021 - Notice:

Service Returned

06/02/2021 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/20/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/20/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/17/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT, PENNY MAC'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME||DEFENDANT, MERS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 10/14/2021 @ 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Clarification; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: VACATING ORDER 09/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: OCTOBER 7, 2021 AT 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ellen M Patterson; MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ellen M Patterson; MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Vazquez Arias Yunia Yulit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Panisello Luis Enrique

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2630181AMT PAID:$30.00 NAME:VELEZ, ARNALDO 35 ALMERIA AVE CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6118 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/18/2021 REGISTER#:263CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570079AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:VELEZ, ARNALDO 35 ALMERIA AVE CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6118 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/15/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Paramount Residential Mortgage Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PENNYMAC CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ellen M Patterson